Global Patent Index - EP 0874114 B1

EP 0874114 B1 2001-05-23 - Security cylinderlock having an increased picking resistance

Title (en)

Security cylinderlock having an increased picking resistance

Title (de)

Zylindersicherheitsschloss mit erhöhtem Einbruchswiderstand

Title (fr)

Cylindre de sûreté pour serrure ayant une protection améloirée contre l'effraction

Publication

EP 0874114 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98400179 A

Priority

FR 9705073 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0874114A1] The lock has a protective sleeve (1) containing a safety barrel with a stator (8) and rotor (9) controlled by a key. Between the forward end of the barrel and the sleeve the lock incorporates an anti-drilling plate (10) with a slot (11) for the key, and a guard ring (18) with a series of inserts (17). The inserts can be conical or curved in shape, having their pointed or curved faces towards the front of the lock and their axes parallel to that of the ring, which is fitted to a step (10) on the anti-drilling plate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 15/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 15/1614 (2013.01); E05B 2015/1628 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0874114 A1 19981028; EP 0874114 B1 20010523; AT 201476 T 20010615; DE 69800819 D1 20010628; DE 69800819 T2 20011108; ES 2158650 T3 20010901; FR 2762637 A1 19981030; FR 2762637 B1 19990709

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-10-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160930

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150108

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050129

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030211

2003-04-25 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2002-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020130

2002-01-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020129

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158650 T3

2001-08-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800819 20010628

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201476 T 20010615

2000-11-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001005

1999-07-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR IT

1999-01-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981118

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT

1998-10-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI