Global Patent Index - EP 0874118 A3

EP 0874118 A3 2000-03-22 - Counter lock for emergency doors with double wings and an anti-panic opening system

Title (en)

Counter lock for emergency doors with double wings and an anti-panic opening system

Title (de)

Gegenschloss für Nottüren mit Doppelflügeln und einer Antipanik-Öffnung

Title (fr)

Contre-serrure pour portes de secours à deux battants et un système d'ouverture anti-panique

Publication

EP 0874118 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98107541 A

Priority

ES 9701113 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0874118A2] One of the normally active double doors has an anti-panic lock with catch bolt (1), while the other door is normally inactive and also has a counter-lock (2) with anti-panic lock. The counter-lock has a top and bottom edge bolt (3,4) with drive mechanisms and a striking-plate opening (5) for the catch bolt. The counter-lock has a horizontally movable ejector (6) ejecting the catch bolt out of the striking-plate opening. The connections for the top and bottom edge bolts with their drive mechanisms are formed by threaded points (7) on the ends of the edge bolts facing the counter-lock. The threaded points are screwed into nuts (8) which are fixed into the drive pieces (16,17) of the edge bolts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/24 (2006.01); E05C 7/04 (2006.01); E05C 9/20 (2006.01); E05B 65/10 (2006.01); E05C 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/24 (2013.01); E05C 7/04 (2013.01); E05C 9/20 (2013.01); E05B 65/1006 (2013.01); E05C 9/042 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0874118 A2 19981028; EP 0874118 A3 20000322; EP 0874118 B1 20031119; AT 254712 T 20031215; DE 59810197 D1 20031224; ES 1037083 U 19980101; ES 1037083 Y 19980616

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070424

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070424

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2008-01-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071101

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040419

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060427

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060420

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-10 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060410

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060329

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-11-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-09-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810197 P 20031224

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL PT

2003-11-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031119

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020925

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB IT NL PT

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000505

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL PT

1998-10-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI