Global Patent Index - EP 0874124 B1

EP 0874124 B1 2001-12-12 - Compensator for play due to wear in the hinges and vertical structural give in doors and gates

Title (en)

Compensator for play due to wear in the hinges and vertical structural give in doors and gates

Title (de)

Ausgleichsvorrichtung für Spiel infolge Verschleisses in Scharnieren und Durchhängen von Türen und Toren

Title (fr)

Compensateur de jeu dû à l'usure dans des charnières et affaissement vertical de la structure des portes et portails

Publication

EP 0874124 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98830226 A

Priority

IT TO970335 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0874124A2] The aim of the invention is to provide a mechanism for easily, rapidly and accurately vertically repositioning a dropped leaf of a door or gate and which acts as a stable fixing for a wheel assembly (R) which is fitted to provide support and reduce friction. The mechanism is constituted by an upper part (1) to be fixed to the projecting edge of the dropped leaf, with a lower part (2) coupled for vertical sliding, once mounted for operation, relative to the upper part (1), and carrying beneath it a plate suitable for fixing the wheel assembly (R); the sliding which determines the adjustment of the leaf is achieved by means of a screw (3) which, once engaged in a threaded female element (4) fixed to one part (1, 2) presses on the other, moving it apart. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 7/06; E06B 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 7/06 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/00 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0874124 A2 19981028; EP 0874124 A3 19990317; EP 0874124 B1 20011212; DE 69802859 D1 20020124; DE 69802859 T2 20030306; ES 2169493 T3 20020701; IT 1293895 B1 19990311; IT TO970335 A1 19981021; IT TO970335 D0 19970421

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130416

2014-06-11 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140611

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130415

2014-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-02-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69802859

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130415

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131231

2013-12-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130415

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121205

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120419

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120416

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120420

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120419

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169493 T3

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69802859 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000905

1999-12-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1999-11-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990901

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-10-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI