Global Patent Index - EP 0874139 B1

EP 0874139 B1 2000-11-29 - Valve operating device of an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Valve operating device of an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Ventiltrieb einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Commande de soupape d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0874139 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98104376 A

Priority

DE 19717537 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0874139A2] The gas-changing valve (2) of the engine is actuated by a camshaft (4) via a cam (3) having two or more working surfaces (15-17) giving different amounts of lift. A cup-type tappet (1) between cam and valve has two or more transmission components, one working with the valve stem (11) and the other with a spring (7) acting in the direction of the camshaft. These two components are coupled together by a sliding component (44) in a first position, and move independently of each other in a second. The component has a locking surface working with a locking component guided in the tappet and working with the camshaft, so that in one position the component is locked in place, while being movable into the other position. The spring acts against the locking component in the tappet. The latter component can work against an unlocking surface on the camshaft so that the component is released in a second position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 13/00; F01L 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/14 (2006.01); F01L 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 13/0036 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0874139 A2 19981028; EP 0874139 A3 19990107; EP 0874139 B1 20001129; DE 19717537 C1 19981224; JP H1113439 A 19990119; US 5950583 A 19990914

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050311

2003-01-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-10-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020311

2002-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-03-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020311

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010329

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-03-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010328

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800352 20010104

2000-12-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-06-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000222

1999-09-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990610

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-10-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI