Global Patent Index - EP 0874164 B1

EP 0874164 B1 2001-12-05 - Furniture hinge

Title (en)

Furniture hinge

Title (de)

Möbelschanier

Title (fr)

Charnière de meuble

Publication

EP 0874164 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98103243 A

Priority

DE 29707057 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2234757A1] A furniture hinge that comprises a hinge part that can be secured to a movable element of the furniture, a hinge arm that is articulated on to the hinge part, and a mounting plate that can be secured to the case of the furniture by means of attachment screws, and which has an appropriate number of supporting pegs that fit into blind holes in the furniture case, is to be configured so as to provide a durable connection that can withstand extremely high loads between the mounting plate and the furniture case. In the furniture hinge according to the present intention, the flanks of the attachment screws are so positioned that their flanks are cut into the associated outside area of the solid supporting pegs (14). The attachment screws (16) are arranged on opposite sides of the supporting pegs. Each supporting peg (14) has an inclined surface (20) at its free end area. The furniture hinge is particularly suitable for household furniture.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16B 12/16; E05D 5/02; F16B 13/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/0276 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01); Y10T 16/554 (2013.01); Y10T 16/5543 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29707057 U1 19970605; AT 210249 T 20011215; BR 9801417 A 19990525; CA 2234757 A1 19981021; CA 2234757 C 20070102; DK 0874164 T3 20020325; EP 0874164 A1 19981028; EP 0874164 B1 20011205; ES 2167816 T3 20020516; JP 4309490 B2 20090805; JP H10306641 A 19981117; US 6070299 A 20000606

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 210249 T

- Effective date: 20180225

2018-02-25 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59802290

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-11-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161028

2016-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150226

2016-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160329

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150225

2016-01-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150228

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150225

2015-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150226

2015-10-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150225

2015-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150225

2015-09-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-09-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150225

2015-09-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-09-21 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20150228

2015-09-02 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20150219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140220

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140225

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140220

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20140221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20140219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140220

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140220

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2167816 T3

2002-03-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802290 20020117

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011205

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LU NL SE

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210249 T 20011215

2000-11-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001005

1999-07-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LU NL SE

1999-01-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981126

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LU NL SE

1998-10-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI