EP 0874189 A1 19981028 - Method for utilization of material comprising a hydrate-like product of gases and tank therefor
Title (en)
Method for utilization of material comprising a hydrate-like product of gases and tank therefor
Title (de)
Verfahren zur Benutzung von hydrat-ähnlichen Gasprodukten und Behälter dafür
Title (fr)
Méthode pour l'utilisation de produits de gaz du type hydrate et réservoir pour cette méthode
Publication
Application
Priority
- JP 10845497 A 19970425
- JP 10988497 A 19970425
- JP 12495997 A 19970428
- JP 12496097 A 19970428
- JP 12496197 A 19970428
- JP 11167697 A 19970430
Abstract (en)
The invention relates to a method of and a tank for utilizing a material comprising a porous material (14, 20, 27), a host compound, such as water, and one or more lower hydrocarbons serving as gust compound wherein a novel and beneficial hydrate-like matter of the lower hydrocarbons are formed inside the fine pores of the porous material (14, 20, 27). The invention is applicable to a method of supplying city gas, a method of controlling a feed of city gas, a city gas tank for supplying city gas or controlling a feed of city gas, a portable and replaceable fuel gas tank, a fuel gas tank for automobile, and the like by utilizing the formation action of the material containing the hydrate-like matter of lower hydrocarbons inside the fine pores of the porous material (14, 20, 27) and the separation and release action of the lower hydrocarbons from the material. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
F17C 11/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP KR)
F17C 11/00 (2013.01 - EP KR); F17C 11/007 (2013.01 - EP)
Citation (search report)
- [XY] DE 903498 C 19540208 - PINTSCH JULIUS KG
- [Y] US 5473904 A 19951212 - GUO BOYUN [US], et al
- [A] US 2663626 A 19531222 - SPANGLER CARL V
- [A] US 2535148 A 19501226 - ARTHUR MARTIN HENRY, et al
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 222 (M - 712) 24 June 1988 (1988-06-24)
- [A] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 80, no. 3, 1974, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 28958, HASHII, KAZUO: "Rare Gas Cathrates" page 121; column l; XP002070265 & JP S4823795 B1 19730716
- [AD] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 288 (C - 1207) 2 June 1994 (1994-06-02)
- [AD] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 004, no. 002 (C - 069) 9 January 1980 (1980-01-09)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE FR GB IT
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0874189 A1 19981028; KR 100264819 B1 20001002; KR 19980081727 A 19981125
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 98107557 A 19980424; KR 19980014785 A 19980424