Global Patent Index - EP 0874201 A3

EP 0874201 A3 2000-05-24 - Assembly for a compact heating installation

Title (en)

Assembly for a compact heating installation

Title (de)

Baueinheit für eine Kompaktheizungsanlage

Title (fr)

Ensemble pour installation de chauffage compact

Publication

EP 0874201 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98107184 A

Priority

DE 19717799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0874201A2] One or other of the two heating circuits are switched on by a switch (10). A dirt-separator (8) and air-separator (9) are housed in the same vertical housing positioned crosswise to the axis of the impeller wheel. A suction pipe (26) leading to the heating circuit for room-heating is attached to the side of the dirt-separator. The suction pipe (19) leading to the heating circuit for hot water preparation near the switch is attached to the housing. A pressure pipe (14) is attached to the side of the circulating pump unit (5,6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 3/10; F24D 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/08 (2006.01); F24D 3/10 (2006.01); F24D 19/00 (2006.01); F24D 19/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/105 (2013.01); F24D 3/08 (2013.01); F24D 19/0095 (2013.01); F24D 19/087 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0874201 A2 19981028; EP 0874201 A3 20000524; EP 0874201 B1 20040218; EP 0874201 B2 20100210; DE 19717799 A1 19981029; DE 19717799 C2 20030320; DE 19717799 C5 20070208

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160428

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160302

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-02-10 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20100210

2010-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-01-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: WILO AG

- Effective date: 20041117

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040408

2004-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810771 P 20040325

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000608

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-10-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI