Global Patent Index - EP 0874208 A3

EP 0874208 A3 2000-01-19 - Radiator, more particularly for connection to a central heating system

Title (en)

Radiator, more particularly for connection to a central heating system

Title (de)

Heizkörper, vorzugsweise zum Anschluss an eine Zentralheizung

Title (fr)

Radiateur,en particulier pour connection à un circuit de chauffage central

Publication

EP 0874208 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98810256 A

Priority

CH 92497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0874208A2] The radiator contains a large number of transverse through holes (15). Two or more sidewalls (22,24) spaced apart and preferably parallel are sealed together by a peripheral one (25). The holes are formed by distance-sleeves (20) joining the sidewalls together at the perforations. The peripheral wall can be formed by bending over one of the sidewalls at the periphery. The sleeves can be welded by laser to the sidewall inside surfaces, the weld seam forming a watertight joint.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 1/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/0366 (2013.01); F28F 2240/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0874208 A2 19981028; EP 0874208 A3 20000119; EP 0874208 B1 20010613; AT 202200 T 20010615; CH 691513 A5 20010731; DE 59800831 D1 20010719

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140324

2015-01-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59800831

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140324

2014-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59800831

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130321

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130322

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090324

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090324

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080328

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080314

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080314

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ARBONIA A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20061001

2006-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061001

2006-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2005-04-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050422

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-03-22 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050322

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-03-16 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050316

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-06-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-10-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010906

2001-08-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DR. ING. AUSSERER ANTON

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2001-07-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59800831

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-07-19

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 202200

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: AMANN, HELMUTH

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL

2000-03-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000214

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991208

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL

1998-10-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI