Global Patent Index - EP 0874211 A3

EP 0874211 A3 2000-05-24 - Armoured vehicle

Title (en)

Armoured vehicle

Title (de)

Kampffahrzeug

Title (fr)

Véhicule blindé

Publication

EP 0874211 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98107527 A

Priority

DE 19717734 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0874211A2] The engine (5.1) is situated to one side of the longitudinal centreline (LMA) of the vehicle hull. It leaves a usable free space (6) on the other side between the crew compartment and the rear end (4) of the vehicle. This space contains a hatch (7) for entry and exit. The engine may be arranged to drive an electric generator on the same side of the vehicle, to supply current for motors driving the tracks. Alternatively a mechanical gearbox may be used, together with a transverse shaft driving the tracks. This shaft may pass across the free space in an enclosed tunnel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41H 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41H 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 7/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] DE 3121145 A1 19891228 - PIETZSCH IBP GMBH [DE]
  • [X] DE 19537945 A1 19970424 - MAK SYSTEM GMBH [DE]
  • [PXA] EP 0825410 A2 19980225 - WEGMANN & CO GMBH [DE]
  • [X] DE 1124399 B 19620222 - RHEINSTAHL HANOMAG AG
  • [X] DE 3116583 A1 19830217 - STOLLBERG KARL DIPL ING
  • [X] US 2487397 A 19491108 - SWENNES BENJAMIN A
  • [A] US 1345245 A 19200629
  • [A] DE 437439 C 19261122 - RENAULT LOUIS
  • [A] DE 3239141 A1 19840426 - STOLLBERG KARL DIPL ING
  • [X] OGORKIEWICZ R M: "ACHZARIT A RADICALLY DIFFERENT ARMOURED INFANTRY VEHICLE", INTERNATIONAL DEFENSE REVIEW,CH,INTERAVIA, COINTRIN- GENEVA, vol. 28, no. 9, Coulsdon (B), pages 73-74, XP000535347, ISSN: 0020-6512
  • [X] "Transportpanzer SIBMAS im Truppendienst von Malaysia", SOLDAT UND TECHNIK, vol. 27, no. 9, 1984, Frankfurt am Main, pages 484 - 485, XP002124854
  • [X] "Der MTWVXB (4x4) Interessantes Mehrzweckfahrzeug von Berliet", SOLDAT UND TECHNIK, no. 5, 1973, Frankfurt am Main, pages 244 - 245, XP002124855
  • [X] F. VON SENGER UND ETTERLIN: "Tanks of the world", 1990, BERNARD & GRAEFE VERLAG, KOBLENZ (DE), XP002124856, 14
  • [X] F. VON SENGER UND ETTERLIN: "Taschenbuch der Panzer", 1976, J.F. LEHMANS VERLAG, MÜNCHEN, XP002124857

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0874211 A2 19981028; EP 0874211 A3 20000524; DE 19717734 A1 19981029

INPADOC legal status


2001-08-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001125

2001-03-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-10-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI