Global patent index - EP 0874420 A3

EP 0874420 A3 2000-01-12 - Shield connection system and connector using the same

Title (en)

Shield connection system and connector using the same

Title (de)

Abschirmungsverbindungssystem und dieses verwendender Verbinder

Title (fr)

Système de connexion d'écran de connexion et connecteur utilisant celui-ci

Publication

EP 0874420 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98107514 A

Priority

  • CA 2240731 A
  • DE 19717628 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0874420A2] A shield connection system for connecting the shields of several individual lines through clamping of the shields between an outer cone and an inner cone, characterized in that a conical ring comprising an outer cone is provided, over which the shields of the individual lines lie spread out, and that the conical ring is pressed against an inner cone provided on part of the adapter. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/658; H01R 9/03; H01R 9/05; H01R 13/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/648 (2006.01); H01R 9/03 (2006.01); H01R 9/05 (2006.01); H01R 24/00 (2006.01); H01R 13/658 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/038 (2013.01); H01R 9/0521 (2013.01); H01R 13/6593 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0874420 A2 19981028; EP 0874420 A3 20000112; CA 2240731 A1 20000110; DE 19717628 A1 19981029; JP H10302898 A 19981113; US 6194654 B1 20010227

INPADOC legal status

2004-05-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031101

2000-10-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: FR GB IT

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 13/658 A, 7H 01R 9/03 B, 7H 01R 9/05 B, 7H 01R 13/58 B

1999-01-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BUEHLER, ROLAND

1999-01-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: OTT, FRANK

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

1998-10-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI