Global Patent Index - EP 0874423 B1

EP 0874423 B1 2002-11-20 - Fixing device for bus bar

Title (en)

Fixing device for bus bar

Title (de)

Tragvorrichtung für eine Stromschiene

Title (fr)

Fixation pour barre de courant

Publication

EP 0874423 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98890104 A

Priority

  • AT 62697 A
  • US 34415499 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0874423A2] The support device (2) has a carrier element (31) attached to an insulating holder (11) provided with a space (12) for reception of the current rail (1), provided by a pair of relatively insulated metal profiles (3,4). The holder is rotationally symmetrical and has limbs (15,16) on either side of the reception space, with spring arms (17,18) with internal locking projections (19,20) locating in respective locking grooves (21,22) in the outside surfaces of the current rail profiles and external locking projections (23,24) for securing a cover cap (26).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 25/14; H01R 13/17; H01R 25/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/17 (2006.01); H01R 25/14 (2006.01); H01R 25/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/17 (2013.01); H01R 25/14 (2013.01); H01R 25/162 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0874423 A2 19981028; EP 0874423 A3 19990908; EP 0874423 B1 20021120; AT 407928 B 20010725; AT A62697 A 20001115; US 6227884 B1 20010508

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-11-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-09-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-07-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030728

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-04-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030424

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SPIERENBURG & PARTNER AG, PATENT- UND MARKENANWAEL

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806315 20030102

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

2002-11-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2001-12-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FIXING DEVICE FOR BUS BAR

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010601

2000-05-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR IT LI

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000219

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6H 01R 25/14 A, 6H 01R 13/17 B, 6H 01R 25/16 B

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

1998-10-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI