Global Patent Index - EP 0874721 B1

EP 0874721 B1 2002-09-18 - CONCRETE STONE AS WELL AS A PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF SUCH A CONCRETE STONE

Title (en)

CONCRETE STONE AS WELL AS A PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF SUCH A CONCRETE STONE

Title (de)

BETONSTEIN, SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SOLCHEN BETONSTEINS

Title (fr)

PIERRE DE BETON ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 0874721 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97900594 A

Priority

  • DE 19600968 A
  • EP 9700104 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9725191A1] Concrete stone, especially concrete stone for laying as paving stone, the visible surface (11) of which at least is mechanically finished after laying through pick-type hammering with blunt striking surface, where the cement residue is chipped off by the mechanical finishing and the grain lying on the upper surface at least is also partially chipped off or hammered.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28D 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28D 1/26 (2006.01); E01C 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 5/06 (2013.01); B28D 1/265 (2013.01); E01C 5/065 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29700358 U1 19970313; AT 224276 T 20021015; DE 19600968 A1 19970807; EP 0874721 A1 19981104; EP 0874721 B1 20020918; WO 9725191 A1 19970717

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59708261

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59708261

2013-12-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BRAUN-STEINE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALBRECHT UND WILFRIED BRAUN, 73340 AMSTETTEN, DE

- Document: DE 59708261

- Effective date: 20131028

2013-12-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59708261

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20131028

2013-10-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59708261

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130326

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-01-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050110

2004-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040123

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-06-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-03-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030328

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2002-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708261 20021024

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

2002-09-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224276 T 20021015

2001-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011105

1998-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980609

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL