Global Patent Index - EP 0874753 A4

EP 0874753 A4 2001-03-14 - HYDRO-AIR DRIVE

Title (en)

HYDRO-AIR DRIVE

Title (de)

HYDROPNEUMATISCHER ANTRIEB

Title (fr)

PROPULSION HYDROPNEUMATIQUE

Publication

EP 0874753 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96903596 A

Priority

US 9600809 W

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 11/01; B63H 11/103; B63H 11/113; B63H 11/117

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63H 11/01 (2006.01); B63H 11/103 (2006.01); B63H 11/113 (2006.01); B63H 11/117 (2006.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

AU 4762596 A 19970811; AU 728072 B2 20010104; EP 0874753 A1 19981104; EP 0874753 A4 20010314

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040129

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030718

2001-03-14 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010126

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE

1999-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE

1998-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980812

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE