Global Patent Index - EP 0874773 B1

EP 0874773 B1 2000-03-15 - DEVICE AND PROCESS FOR DEPOSITING SIGNATURES OR FOLDED PRODUCTS

Title (en)

DEVICE AND PROCESS FOR DEPOSITING SIGNATURES OR FOLDED PRODUCTS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ABLEGEN VON SIGNATUREN ODER FALZPRODUKTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR DEPOSER DES SIGNATURES OU DES PRODUITS PLIES

Publication

EP 0874773 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96946228 A

Priority

  • DE 9602498 W
  • DE 19600374 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19600374A1] In a device and process for depositing products, the aim is to deposit high-quality products and prevent damage to them. According to the invention, this is achieved by means of a rotating stripper fitted in addition to a fixed one.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/40; B65H 29/66; B65H 29/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/40 (2006.01); B65H 29/66 (2006.01); B65H 29/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/6609 (2013.01); B65H 29/40 (2013.01); B65H 29/68 (2013.01); B65H 2301/44732 (2013.01); B65H 2301/44765 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2301/44732 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2301/44765 + B65H 2220/02

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19600374 A1 19970710; DE 59604708 D1 20000420; EP 0874773 A2 19981104; EP 0874773 B1 20000315; ES 2146039 T3 20000716; JP 3040491 B2 20000515; JP H11504892 A 19990511; US 6139009 A 20001031; WO 9725269 A2 19970717; WO 9725269 A3 19970828

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081220

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081222

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2010-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20081222

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081220

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081220

2009-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071214

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071219

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071219

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-02-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20071224

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071227

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146039 T3

2000-06-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604708 20000420

2000-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-03-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990226

1998-12-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1998-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980701

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI