Global Patent Index - EP 0874887 B1

EP 0874887 B1 2000-03-22 - IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO ANTIMICROBIAL CLEANING COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO ANTIMICROBIAL CLEANING COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

VERBESSERUNG IN BEZUG AUF ANTIMIKROBIELLE REINIGUNGSMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN

Title (fr)

AMELIORATIONS CONCERNANT DES COMPOSITIONS DE NETTOYAGE ANTIMICROBIENNES

Publication

EP 0874887 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96938139 A

Priority

  • EP 9604876 W
  • GB 9525155 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9721795A1] The invention provides a hygienic cleaning composition of pH < 6 or pH > 8 which comprises: a) 0.01-30 wt.% on product of an ethoxylated nonionic surfactant, other than an alkyl phenol derivative, said surfactant having an HLB of 10-14 (this is typically an ethoxylated alcohol having a chain length of C8-C14 and 4-10 ethoxy groups per molecule), and, b) 1-30 wt.% on product of a C1-C5 linear or branched alcohol (this is typically selected from the group comprising propan-2-ol, propanol, ethanol and mixtures thereof). It is believed that the use of 1-30 wt.% of a C1-C5 linear or branched alcohol as a biocidal activity improving additive for the selected nonionic surfactants greatly improves the biocidal properties of the compositions under the pH conditions specified. The specification also provides a method of cleaning and disinfecting a hard surface which comprises the step of treating said surface with a cleaning composition as claimed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/00; C11D 1/72; C11D 3/43

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/2017 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01); C11D 3/2006 (2013.01); C11D 3/201 (2013.01); C11D 3/48 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9721795 A1 19970619; AU 699602 B2 19981210; AU 7567396 A 19970703; BR 9611979 A 19990217; CA 2235680 A1 19970619; CA 2235680 C 20020305; DE 69607391 D1 20000427; DE 69607391 T2 20000727; EP 0874887 A1 19981104; EP 0874887 B1 20000322; ES 2146421 T3 20000801; GB 9525155 D0 19960207; ZA 9609481 B 19980512

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051102

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-08-09 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20060622

2006-08-09 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Free Format Text: 20060622

2006-01-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060102

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051124

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051117

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051102

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-02-09 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20001219

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20001219

2000-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2146421

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-06-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69607391

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-27

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990611

1998-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980409

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT