Global patent index - EP 0874921 B1

EP 0874921 B1 2000-01-12 - PROCESS AND SYSTEM FOR ELECTROCHEMICAL TREATMENT OF LONG STRETCHED-OUT ITEMS

Title (en)

PROCESS AND SYSTEM FOR ELECTROCHEMICAL TREATMENT OF LONG STRETCHED-OUT ITEMS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ELEKTROCHEMISCHEN BEHANDELN LANGGESTRECKTER GEGENSTÄNDE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT ELECTROCHIMIQUE D'OBJETS LONGILIGNES

Publication

EP 0874921 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97940064 A

Priority

  • DE 19632132 A
  • DE 19722983 A
  • EP 9704341 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9806884A1] The invention relates to a process and a system for electrochemical treatment of long stretched-out items, especially sticks, wherein an item maintained by one end in a clamp (3) is introduced, along an as eccentric an axis as possible, into a hollow space with its longitudinal axis located in an electrode (30) mounted in a dipping bath and one wall of which is parallel to the axis. Said item is passed through at least one perforated and axially mobile protective mask (23, 26), thus protecting the part of the area not to be submitted to electrochemical treatment from the electrode. Besides, said item and electrode are connected to the poles of a current source. The system includes a treatment liquid tank (14) containing at least one electrode (30) having a hollow space, with a longitudinal axis and an axially-parallel wall, for introducing the item therein; It also includes a protective mask (23, 26) so mounted that it can move along the axis inside the hollow space, has openings for the passage of said item and is directed to protecting specific item areas from electrochemical treatment. Lastly, it includes at least one current source and electric connections from the connecting current source poles to the electrode and the item.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 17/06; C25F 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 5/02 (2006.01); C25D 7/04 (2006.01); C25D 17/06 (2006.01); C25F 3/14 (2006.01); C25F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25F 7/00 (2013.01); C25D 5/022 (2013.01); C25D 7/04 (2013.01); C25D 17/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9806884 A1 19980219; EP 0874921 A1 19981104; EP 0874921 B1 20000112; ES 2142690 T3 20000416; JP 2000516303 A 20001205; JP 4139439 B2 20080827

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150807

2016-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150807

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150820

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150821

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140820

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-05-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ATOTECH DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20130831

2012-12-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120824

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000407

2000-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2142690

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-03-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59700999

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000217

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

1999-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981123

1998-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980819

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT