Global patent index - EP 0874933 B1

EP 0874933 B1 2000-06-14 - SOLEPLATE FOR AN IRON

Title (en)

SOLEPLATE FOR AN IRON

Title (de)

BÜGELEISENSOHLE

Title (fr)

SEMELLE DE FER A REPASSER

Publication

EP 0874933 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97900634 A

Priority

  • FR 9700053 W
  • FR 9600498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9726399A2] A soleplate for an iron comprising a cast heating body (1) with an outer edge (4) having a tip (6) and a heel (8), as well as a metal ironing plate (10) having a matching shape and including a pointed front portion (12) and a rear portion (14), and comprising an inner surface (16), an outer surface (20) coated with a coating (22) and a rim (24) arranged around the side of the outer edge (4) of the heating body and provided with means for attaching it thereto. The means for attaching the rim (24) comprise a preformed curled edge (26) for capping said tip (6) at least in said front portion (12), and at least one hook (28) for engaging the heel (8) in said rear portion (14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 75/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 75/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 75/38 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9726399 A2 19970724; WO 9726399 A3 20021003; CN 1260013 A 20000712; DE 69702300 D1 20000720; DE 69702300 T2 20010215; EP 0874933 A2 19981104; EP 0874933 B1 20000614; FR 2743578 A1 19970718; FR 2743578 B1 19990611; RU 2167230 C2 20010520; US 6134817 A 20001024

INPADOC legal status

2004-09-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040113

2004-01-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040113

2003-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-01-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030124

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT NL

2002-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020129

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2000-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69702300

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-20

2000-07-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT NL

2000-06-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-06-14 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000614

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990208

1998-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980817

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT NL