Global Patent Index - EP 0874966 B1

EP 0874966 B1 2000-10-11 - STEAM LINE

Title (en)

STEAM LINE

Title (de)

DAMPFLEITUNG

Title (fr)

CONDUITE DE VAPEUR

Publication

EP 0874966 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97906991 A

Priority

  • DE 9700028 W
  • DE 19601886 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19601886C1] The invention concerns a steam line (1) designed to pass through a wall (2) in a steam power station, the steam line forming an anchorage point with the wall (2). A main valve (4) is connected directly to the line (1) at the anchorage point. Attached to the main-valve housing is at least one secondary valve (5 to 7). The invention calls for at least one additional valve (8, 9) to be mounted on the housing of a secondary valve (5 to 7) without any high-pressure piping between them and without any support.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F22B 37/44; F16K 11/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F22B 37/20 (2006.01); F22B 37/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F22B 37/44 (2013.01); Y10T 137/698 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19601886 C1 19970807; EP 0874966 A1 19981104; EP 0874966 B1 20001011; ID 16584 A 19971016; JP 2000503755 A 20000328; US 6011826 A 20000104; WO 9726484 A1 19970724

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160131

2016-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160131

2016-10-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160930

2016-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702455

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150115

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150123

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150127

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-08-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AREVA GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AREVA NP GMBH, 91052 ERLANGEN, DE

- Document: DE 59702455

- Effective date: 20130618

2013-08-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59702455

- Representative's name: TERGAU & WALKENHORST PATENTANWAELTE - RECHTSAN, DE

- Effective date: 20130618

2013-08-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59702455

- Representative's name: TERGAU & WALKENHORST PATENTANWAELTE PARTGMBB, DE

- Effective date: 20130618

2013-06-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59702455

- Representative's name: TERGAU & WALKENHORST PATENTANWAELTE - RECHTSAN, DE

2010-08-27 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2010-08-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2010-08-27 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-11-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALT DR. MICHAEL FISCHER

2008-11-14 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: AREVA NP GMBH

- Free text: FRAMATOME ANP GMBH#FREYESLEBENSTRASSE 1#91058 ERLANGEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- AREVA NP GMBH#PAUL-GOSSEN-STRASSE 100#91052 ERLANGEN (DE)

2002-02-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT TRANSFER- FRAMATOME ANP

2001-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-09-26 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FRAMATOME ANP GMBH

2001-01-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702455 20001116

2000-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-10-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

2000-03-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990630

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990630

1998-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980707

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI