Global patent index - EP 0874973 A4

EP 0874973 A4 2001-01-10 - METHOD FOR INTERFEROMETER BASED SPECTRAL IMAGING OF MOVING OBJECTS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR INTERFEROMETER BASED SPECTRAL IMAGING OF MOVING OBJECTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR INTERFEROMETRISCHEN SPEKTRALEN ABBILDUNG VON SICH BEWEGENDEN OBJEKTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'IMAGERIE SPECTRALE D'OBJETS MOBILES METTANT EN OEUVRE UN INTERFEROMETRE

Publication

EP 0874973 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97926494 A

Priority

  • IL 11952096 A
  • US 9708153 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9819293A1] A method for spatial registration and spectral correction for interferometer based spectral imaging which can be used to obtain spectral images of a moving object, the method comprising the steps of (a) using an interferometer based spectral imager for acquiring spatial and spectral information of the moving object; and (b) correcting the spatial and spectral information for movements of the moving object via a spatial registration and spectral correction procedures for obtaining corrected spatial and spectral information.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01B 9/02; G01J 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 3/14 (2006.01); G01B 9/02 (2006.01); G01J 3/45 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

G02B (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01J 3/45 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9603615 A1 19960208 - C I SYSTEMS ISRAEL LTD [IL], et al
  • [A] P.D. HAMMER ET AL.: "Remote Sensing of Earth's Atmosphere and Surface Using a Digital Array Scanned Interferometer:A New Type of Imaging Spectrometer", JOURNAL OF IMAGING SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, vol. 36, no. 5, September 1992 (1992-09-01) - October 1992 (1992-10-01), Springfield,VA,USA, pages 417 - 422, XP000371792
  • See also references of WO 9819293A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9819293 A1 19980507; AU 3125197 A 19980522; EP 0874973 A1 19981104; EP 0874973 A4 20010110; IL 119520 D0 19970110; IL 124848 A 20030706; IL 124848 D0 19990126; JP 2000506982 A 20000606; JP 3474883 B2 20031208

INPADOC legal status

2003-07-09 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030509

2001-01-10 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20001127

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-01-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 01B 9/02 A, 7G 01J 3/28 B

1999-03-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: APPLIED SPECTRAL IMAGING ( ASI) LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980629

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT