Global Patent Index - EP 0875129 B1

EP 0875129 B1 2000-01-12 - GAS DISCHARGE LAMP

Title (en)

GAS DISCHARGE LAMP

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETREIBEN EINER GASENTLADUNGSLAMPE

Title (fr)

LAMPE LUMINESCENTE A GAZ

Publication

EP 0875129 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97947024 A

Priority

  • DE 9702486 W
  • DE 19646861 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19646861C1] Disclosed is a device for operating a gas discharge lamp (16), comprising a DC/DC converter (10) which converts an input voltage (11) corresponding to the standard voltage into two output voltages differing from said standard voltage (12). The gas discharge lamp (16) is connected through an activating circuit (15) to those output voltage of different values.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/282 (2006.01); H05B 41/292 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/2928 (2013.01); Y10S 315/07 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19646861 C1 19980416; EP 0875129 A1 19981104; EP 0875129 B1 20000112; ES 2142692 T3 20000416; JP 2000503469 A 20000321; US 6078149 A 20000620; WO 9821920 A1 19980522

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051025

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20011113

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-06-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011025

2002-02-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011025

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001215

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-10-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2142692 T3

2000-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-03-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701000 20000217

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-01-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000112

1999-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990326

1999-01-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981123

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT