Global Patent Index - EP 0875168 A3

EP 0875168 A3 2000-02-23 - Applicator device for liquids

Title (en)

Applicator device for liquids

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Auftragen von Flüssigkeiten

Title (fr)

Dispositif applicateur pour liquide

Publication

EP 0875168 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 98202441 A

Priority

  • EP 94402607 A
  • FR 9314235 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0655208A1] Applicator device for a liquid, including a container (1) and a dispensing dome (9) connected to the said container by a dispensing head (7, 8, 10): the dispensing dome (9) is produced in a porous material; the container is a pressurised reservoir (1) equipped with a dispensing valve (4), the dispensing dome (9) being carried by a support (8) mechanically linked to a connecting piece (13) capable of interacting with the said valve (4) to cause it to open through the action of mechanical stressing exerted on the dispensing dome (9); the liquid ejected outside the reservoir (1) during said opening is channelled through the said connecting piece (13) towards the face (9b) of the dispensing dome (9) which is opposite the outer face (9a) of the said dome (9); the dispensing head includes an attaching member (7) making it possible to secure the said head to the reservoir (1), the attaching member being a rigid skirt (7) fastened on the reservoir (1); a flexible element (10) connects the said attaching member (7) and the support (8), the rigid skirt (7) being connected in the vicinity of its upper border (7a) to a cylindrical wall, which constitutes the flexible element (10); the dispensing head (7, 10, 8) is produced in a single piece by moulding plastic material. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 34/04; B65D 83/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 34/04 (2006.01); B65D 83/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/285 (2013.01); A45D 34/04 (2013.01); A45D 2200/1018 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0655208 A1 19950531; EP 0655208 B1 19990714; CA 2136585 A1 19950530; CA 2136585 C 19990202; DE 69419481 D1 19990819; DE 69419481 T2 19991118; DE 69432872 D1 20030731; DE 69432872 T2 20031218; EP 0875168 A2 19981104; EP 0875168 A3 20000223; EP 0875168 B1 20030625; ES 2133510 T3 19990916; ES 2196478 T3 20031216; FR 2713060 A1 19950609; FR 2713060 B1 19960202; US 5567073 A 19961022

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20141118

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20141116

2015-01-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150126

2014-12-10 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20141116

2014-11-18 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69432872

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131011

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131112

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131113

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131108

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131113

- Year of fee payment: 20

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2003-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2196478 T3

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69432872 P 20030731

2003-07-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0655208 P

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-05 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020219

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-04-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DE LAFORCADE, VINCENT

1999-04-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GUILLAUMAT-LOUVARD, FANNY

1999-04-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DUBOIS, LAURENT

1998-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980721

1998-11-04 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 655208

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT