Global Patent Index - EP 0875177 A3

EP 0875177 A3 2000-08-02 - Opening- and closing mechanism for a drawer of a furniture element

Title (en)

Opening- and closing mechanism for a drawer of a furniture element

Title (de)

Öffnungs- und Schliessmechanismus für einen Auszug eines Möbelelementes

Title (fr)

Mécanisme d'ouverture et de fermeture pour un tiroir dans un élément de meuble

Publication

EP 0875177 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98810351 A

Priority

CH 102097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0875177A2] The drawer fitment (1) is slid out and in along guides (6) on the furniture element (1) to which a magnet (25) is attached. A ferromagnetic plate (24) rests against the magnet when the pull-out element is closed. A foot-operated and swivelling lever (21) by which the plate is detached from the magnet is mounted in a holder on the furniture element. A spring element (27) pulls the drawer fitment out. The holder consists of at least one angle-piece (12,13) one arm (14) of which is fixed flat to the base (5) of the furniture element, and the other arm (15) rests against the end side (16) of the fitment base. A part (17) protruding on the underside from the base has at least one bearing element (18) holding the pivot axle (19).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 88/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/00 (2006.01); A47B 88/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/463 (2017.01); A47B 2088/4015 (2017.01); Y10T 292/11 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0875177 A2 19981104; EP 0875177 A3 20000802; JP 2874868 B2 19990324; JP H10304944 A 19981117; US 5975662 A 19991102

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030510

2003-01-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FURNITURE ELEMENT WITH A DRAWER WITH OPENING- AND CLOSING MECHANISM

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020807

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1998-11-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI