Global Patent Index - EP 0875185 A3

EP 0875185 A3 2000-03-01 - Safety device

Title (en)

Safety device

Title (de)

Sicherheitsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sécurité

Publication

EP 0875185 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98303228 A

Priority

GB 9708550 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0875185A2] A moveable device having a seat portion; a base portion; one or more legs connecting the seat portion to the base portion, and a plurality of wheels or castors attachable to a lower surface of the base, the device further comprising safety device (15) for preventing movement of the device when one or more of the wheels or castors is positioned at a substantially different level to the remaining wheels or castors. By virtue of a high friction engagement between the safety device and the floor, further movement of the device is prevented. The safety device engages the floor if the device goes over an edge, for instance. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47D 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47D 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47D 13/043 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0875185 A2 19981104; EP 0875185 A3 20000301; GB 9708550 D0 19970618

INPADOC legal status


2001-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001101

2000-12-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-11-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI