Global Patent Index - EP 0875186 A3

EP 0875186 A3 2000-08-30 - Display apparatus

Title (en)

Display apparatus

Title (de)

Präsentationsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de présentation

Publication

EP 0875186 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98303460 A

Priority

GB 9709069 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0875186A2] Display apparatus 1 for the display of consumable products comprises a plastics receptacle 4 received in a cardboard base 2 and a plastics insert 14 of mesh construction received in the receptacle 4. Pre-chilled gel bags 16 are positioned between the receptacle 4 and the insert 14 for cooling chocolate bars or similar products stored in the unit 1. The mesh construction of the insert 14 spaces the gel bags 16 from the chocolate bars, thereby preventing condensation deposition on the bars. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 3/04; A47F 5/11

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/04 (2006.01); A47F 5/11 (2006.01); F25D 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 5/114 (2013.01); A47F 3/0404 (2013.01); F25D 3/06 (2013.01); F25D 2303/0832 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0875186 A2 19981104; EP 0875186 A3 20000830; GB 2324853 A 19981104; GB 9709069 D0 19970625

INPADOC legal status


2001-06-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-06-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001201

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-11-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI