Global Patent Index - EP 0875213 B1

EP 0875213 B1 2001-12-05 - Fixture provided with micro-threads

Title (en)

Fixture provided with micro-threads

Title (de)

Befestigung mit Micro-Gewinde

Title (fr)

Ancrage avec micro-filets

Publication

EP 0875213 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98108329 A

Priority

  • EP 93923078 A
  • SE 9202911 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9407428A1] The present invention relates to an implant having a body (1) with at least one generally cylindrical part to be implanted into bone tissue. The cylindrical part is at least partly provided with threads (2) having a height between 0.02 mm and 0.20 mm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61C 8/00; A61F 2/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/58 (2006.01); A61B 17/86 (2006.01); A61C 8/00 (2006.01); A61F 2/28 (2006.01); A61F 2/00 (2006.01); A61F 2/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61C 8/0022 (2013.01); A61B 17/8625 (2013.01); A61C 8/0025 (2013.01); A61F 2/30749 (2013.01); A61F 2/30767 (2013.01); A61F 2002/3085 (2013.01); A61F 2002/30851 (2013.01); A61F 2002/30856 (2013.01); A61F 2002/30864 (2013.01); A61F 2220/0008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9407428 A1 19940414; AT 174779 T 19990115; AT 209877 T 20011215; AU 5288193 A 19940426; AU 664785 B2 19951130; CA 2145300 A1 19940414; CA 2145300 C 20050111; DE 69322799 D1 19990204; DE 69322799 T2 19990624; DE 69331290 D1 20020117; DE 69331290 T2 20020808; DK 0768846 T3 19990823; EP 0768846 A1 19970423; EP 0768846 B1 19981223; EP 0875213 A2 19981104; EP 0875213 A3 19981111; EP 0875213 B1 20011205; ES 2127295 T3 19990416; FI 107693 B 20010928; FI 951587 A0 19950404; FI 951587 A 19950404; IS 4077 A 19940406; JP 2005270682 A 20051006; JP H08501962 A 19960305; NO 322525 B1 20061016; NO 951174 A 19950327; NO 951174 D0 19950327; NZ 256919 A 19951221; SE 9202911 D0 19921005; US 5816813 A 19981006; US 5938444 A 19990817

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-08-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69331290

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130628

2013-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121001

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111014

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101014

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101005

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-08-06 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-05-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030501

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-01 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-10-01 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-06-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-05-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-03-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-03-05 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-03-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69331290 20020117

2002-01-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 768846

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 209877 T 20011215

2001-01-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FIXTURE PROVIDED WITH MICRO-THREADS

2000-06-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASTRAZENECA AB

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000203

1999-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990511

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-11-04 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 768846

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE