Global patent index - EP 0875303 A3

EP 0875303 A3 2000-01-12 - Method for operating a rolling mill for warm and cold rolling flat products

Title (en)

Method for operating a rolling mill for warm and cold rolling flat products

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Walzwerks für das Warm- und Kaltwalzen von Flachprodukten

Title (fr)

Procédé pour faire fonctionner un laminoir pour le laminage à chaud et à froid de produits plats

Publication

EP 0875303 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98107702 A

Priority

DE 19718529 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0875303A2] The method concerns operation of a mill for hot and cold rolling of flat products in single or multiple arrangements of roll stands with two or more rolls. Control of the roll gap takes place with correction of the force difference between the roll drive and operator ends, and compensation of the settings correcting the bending and balancing forces. The method is characterised by the fact that the control system has an additional corrective quantity formed through measurement of the horizontal forces on all individual rolls.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 37/58; B21B 37/28; B21B 37/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 31/16 (2006.01); B21B 37/00 (2006.01); B21B 37/28 (2006.01); B21B 37/38 (2006.01); B21B 37/42 (2006.01); B21B 37/58 (2006.01); B21B 38/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 37/28 (2013.01); B21B 37/42 (2013.01); B21B 37/58 (2013.01); B21B 38/105 (2013.01); B21B 2038/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0875303 A2 19981104; EP 0875303 A3 20000112; EP 0875303 B1 20040204; AT 258829 T 20040215; BR 9801537 A 19990309; CN 1138603 C 20040218; CN 1200963 A 19981209; DE 19718529 A1 19981112; ES 2216199 T3 20041016; JP H10314819 A 19981202; US 6142000 A 20001107

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160413

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160413

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150429

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59810693

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Owner name: SMS GROUP GMBH, DE

- Free Format Text: FORMER OWNER: SMS SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 40237 DUESSELDORF, DE

2015-08-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59810693

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HEMMERICH & KOLLEGEN, DE

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150413

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-01-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-10-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2216199

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-06-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-03-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59810693

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20040311

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2004-02-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020527

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7B 21B 37/58 A, 7B 21B 37/42 B, 7B 21B 37/28 B

1998-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980428

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

1998-11-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI