Global Patent Index - EP 0875306 B1

EP 0875306 B1 2000-10-11 - CONTINUOUS SUPPLY SYSTEM FOR PRESS

Title (en)

CONTINUOUS SUPPLY SYSTEM FOR PRESS

Title (de)

SYSTEM ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN ZUFUHR AN EINE PRESSE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'ALIMENTATION EN CONTINU DE PRESSES

Publication

EP 0875306 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97933700 A

Priority

  • ES 9700199 W
  • ES 9601740 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0875306A1] The disclosed system is comprised of a welding device (4) intended to weld a bobbin running out to a new bobbin; a rectifier (7) for rectifying the metal strip (1); and a storage device (5) formed by a lower frame (5a) and an upper frame (5b) which are independent of each other, facing each other and one on top of the other; the frames (5a, 5b) comprise guides (11) which define an ideal spiral along which the metal strip (1) may slide from its external extremity (12) up to its internal extremity (13), both being situated in the lower frame (5a); the latter is fixed, whereas the upper frame (5b) is displaceable vertically, thereby varying consequently the total length of the stored metal strip (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 49/00; B21D 43/00; B65H 20/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 49/00 (2006.01); B21D 43/00 (2006.01); B65H 20/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 43/006 (2013.01); B21C 49/00 (2013.01); B65H 20/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0875306 A1 19981104; EP 0875306 B1 20001011; CA 2233559 A1 19980212; DE 69703281 D1 20001116; DE 69703281 T2 20010517; ES 2123425 A1 19990101; ES 2123425 B1 19990701; WO 9805441 A1 19980212

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080731

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070515

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070716

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070725

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-07-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070726

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUZZI, NOTARO&ANTONIELLI D'OULX

2000-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703281 20001116

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000203

1998-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980409

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT