Global Patent Index - EP 0875316 B1

EP 0875316 B1 2002-09-04 - Strand withdrawing apparatus

Title (en)

Strand withdrawing apparatus

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Ausziehen eines Stranges

Title (fr)

Appareil pour l'extraction d'une barre

Publication

EP 0875316 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98250112 A

Priority

DE 19717914 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0875316A2] The apparatus serves for extraction of billets, in particular, from a continuous casting mould. It incorporates two driven rolls (1, 4) which contact the billet on two opposite sides. These rolls are movable towards and away from one another, and can be pressed against the billet surfaces via their bearing blocks. By means of a tension member (3) each bearing block of a roll (1) is connected to a spindle or gearwheel transmission unit or a piston and cylinder unit (3) whose other member (7) is connected to the bearing blocks of the roll (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/128

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/128 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/128 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FI FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19717914 A1 19981029; DE 19717914 C2 19990512; AT 223271 T 20020915; EP 0875316 A2 19981104; EP 0875316 A3 19990922; EP 0875316 B1 20020904; JP 3770520 B2 20060426; JP H10296411 A 19981110; US 6062295 A 20000516

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805371

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100327

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090327

2009-10-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090324

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060322

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080314

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080314

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070327

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080314

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070327

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MANNESMANN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Free text: MANNESMANN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#MANNESMANNUFER 2#40213 DUESSELDORF (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MANNESMANN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#MANNESMANNUFER 2#40213 DUESSELDORF (DE)

2007-03-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070327

2006-03-15 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20060315

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2002-10-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805371 20021010

2002-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-09-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI FR GB IT LI

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223271 T 20020915

2002-02-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011221

2000-05-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FI FR GB IT LI

1999-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991025

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI FR GB IT LI

1998-11-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI