Global Patent Index - EP 0875338 A3

EP 0875338 A3 2000-05-17 - Knife ring cutter

Title (en)

Knife ring cutter

Title (de)

Messerringzerspaner

Title (fr)

Déchiqueteuse à lames-couronne

Publication

EP 0875338 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98102850 A

Priority

DE 19718681 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0875338A2] A grinder-ring is turned in steps on its axis by distances depending on the space between the blades. Several grinder-tools travel in the direction of the axis of the knife-ring so as to sharpen individual blades. The grinder tools are fixed together. The total amount of metal pared off is reached when the last grinder tool has turned in the ring's revolution. At least one of the grinder tools is a cup wheel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 3/36; B27L 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 3/36 (2006.01); B27L 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27L 11/00 (2013.01); B24B 3/363 (2013.01); B24B 3/368 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0875338 A2 19981104; EP 0875338 A3 20000517; EP 0875338 B1 20030115; BR 9801515 A 19990928; DE 19718681 A1 19981105; ES 2187842 T3 20030616; US 6036588 A 20000314

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160219

2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150220

2016-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160329

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150302

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150219

2015-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151030

2015-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150219

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150228

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150224

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140224

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140224

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140225

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140212

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-08-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2187842 T3

2003-02-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030115

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE ES FR GB IT

2003-01-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-03-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE ES FR GB IT

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000602

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE ES FR GB IT

1998-11-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI