Global patent index - EP 0875375 B1

EP 0875375 B1 2000-07-19 - Device for detachably coupling a double toothed wheel

Title (en)

Device for detachably coupling a double toothed wheel

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum lösbaren Kuppeln eines Doppelzahnrades

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour embrayer de façon détachable une roue dentée double

Publication

EP 0875375 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98106663 A

Priority

DE 19718140 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0875375A1] The connector, which can also disconnect, has a clamping ring acted on by sprung elements. The clamping can be released by a separating coupling which reduces or eliminates the spring force of the sprung elements. A connecting element, without play in rotation but sprung axially, is fitted between the clamping ring (7) and elements fixed to the paper feed cylinder. There may be a coupling disc (16) fixed on one side to the gear wheel flange (3) carrying the main gear wheel (4), and on the other side to the clamping ring.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/008

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/00 (2006.01); B41F 13/008 (2006.01); B41F 21/10 (2006.01); F16H 55/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19718140 C1 19981001; AT 194799 T 20000815; EP 0875375 A1 19981104; EP 0875375 B1 20000719; JP 2978149 B2 19991115; JP H10309792 A 19981124

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59800201

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100423

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-04-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050411

2005-02-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040411

2004-04-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040411

2004-04-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040411

2003-04-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030408

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-03 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030403

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030326

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-12-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2000-10-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59800201

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-24

2000-08-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-07-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-07-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-07-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 194799

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-07-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990324

1998-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980831

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-11-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI