Global Patent Index - EP 0875434 B1

EP 0875434 B1 2001-12-12 - Pivoting and sliding door for passenger transporting vehicles

Title (en)

Pivoting and sliding door for passenger transporting vehicles

Title (de)

Schwenkschiebetür für Fahrzeuge zur Personenbeförderung

Title (fr)

Porte pivotable et coulissante pour véhicules de transport de personnes

Publication

EP 0875434 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98890118 A

Priority

AT 73597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0875434A1] The door has at least one panel (1,2) displaceable longitudinally on a guide component (5), which is movable as part of link rectangle crossways to its plane. The driven force of a door drive member (29) engages on the door panel (2) at least in the direction of the guide component. The reaction force of the drive device moves the guide component crossways to the plane of the door panel. The link rectangle is a link parallelogram. On arms formed as pivot plates (6) rotatably located on the vehicle bodywork, the drive (29) running parallel to the guide component and the operating arms (22) for pivoting the door beam tube (23) are located. At least one spring (23) engages preferably on the door beam tube or the pivot plates (6) and impels the door mechanism (3) into the closed position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 19/00; B61D 19/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 19/00 (2006.01); B61D 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 19/008 (2013.01); B61D 19/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB GR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0875434 A1 19981104; EP 0875434 B1 20011212; AT 210573 T 20011215; AT 405155 B 19990625; AT A73597 A 19981015; BR 9801453 A 20011127; CA 2235877 A1 19981028; CN 1197737 A 19981104; DE 59802393 D1 20020124; PL 186863 B1 20040331; PL 326022 A1 19981109

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150423

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151103

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150423

2016-01-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151231

2015-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150423

2015-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 210573 T

- Effective date: 20150423

2015-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802393

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140425

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140425

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140627

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140424

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-05-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-04-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050423

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020307

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802393 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB GR IT

2001-12-12 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210573 T 20011215

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010327

1999-07-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB GR IT

1999-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990504

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB GR IT

1998-11-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI