Global Patent Index - EP 0875450 A3

EP 0875450 A3 2000-05-24 - Cycloidal propeller

Title (en)

Cycloidal propeller

Title (de)

Zykloidalpropeller

Title (fr)

Propulseur cycloidal

Publication

EP 0875450 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98106920 A

Priority

DE 19718682 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0875450A2] The cylinder assembly comprises a cylinder (1), in which a piston (3) is movable backwards and forwards. Connected to the piston is a thrust rod (9) for adjustment of the cycloidal propeller vanes. A lever (25) controls the movement of the piston (3) and is articulatedly connected with the thrust rod. The cylinder is of the hydraulic type. Between the thrust rod and the control lever, an intermediate rod (33) is positioned, articulatedly connected both with the thrust rod and with the control lever. The cylinder at its end remote from the thrust rod, is connectable to a support structure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63H 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63H 1/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0875450 A2 19981104; EP 0875450 A3 20000524; DE 19718682 C1 19981126; NO 311076 B1 20011008; NO 981912 A 19981103; NO 981912 D0 19980428

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030623

2003-07-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH SCHIFFSTECHNIK GMBH & CO. KG

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020117

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB IT NL

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001109

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

1998-11-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI