Global Patent Index - EP 0875484 B1

EP 0875484 B1 2000-07-26 - Method and device for removing air from the head space above a liquid in filled containers

Title (en)

Method and device for removing air from the head space above a liquid in filled containers

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Entfernen von Luft aus dem Freiraum über der Flüssigkeit in gefüllten Behältern

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour chasser l'air de l'espace au-dessus du liquide remplissant des récipients

Publication

EP 0875484 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98107051 A

Priority

DE 19718276 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0875484A1] The method involve using an apparatus (7) for generating at least one jet of inert gas (8). The apparatus is positioned between the filler (2) and a container-closing appliance (6). The inert gas jet is directed onto the surface of the liquid in the container (1) and adjusted so that the gas-jet penetrates the liquid which is foamed exactly up to the top rim of the container. The ambient air above the surface of the liquid in the container is displaced. The apparatus producing the inert gas jet has a double pipe (9) which consists of an inner (10) pipe subjected to high pressure gas, and an outer (11) pipe exposed to low pressure inert gas.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67C 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67C 3/10 (2006.01); B65B 3/18 (2006.01); B67C 3/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67C 3/222 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0875484 A1 19981104; EP 0875484 B1 20000726; AT 194969 T 20000815; CZ 9801348 A3 19981216; DE 19718276 A1 19981105

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021101

2002-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020417

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010528

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-04-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010411

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-01-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000726

2001-01-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Free text: LINDE TECHNISCHE GASE GMBH TRANSFER- LINDE GAS AG

2000-12-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800211 20000831

2000-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19981125

2000-07-26 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194969 T 20000815

2000-04-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE TECHNISCHE GASE GMBH

1999-07-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB LI

1999-07-14 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19981125

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990301

1999-01-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981125

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

1998-11-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI