Global Patent Index - EP 0875556 A3

EP 0875556 A3 2001-01-24 - Rinse aid for plasticware

Title (en)

Rinse aid for plasticware

Title (de)

Klarspüler für Kunststoffgeschirr

Title (fr)

Agent de rinçage pour vaisselle en plastique

Publication

EP 0875556 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98301705 A

Priority

  • US 84111097 A
  • US 84119897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0875556A2] A rinse aid composition for use on plasticware is herein described which requires lower concentration of conventional hydrocarbon surfactants, exhibits adequate sheeting on the plasticware and acceptable drying time which prior rinse aids have failed to provide without special handling. The compositions described contain hydrocarbon surfactants and a polyether or polybetaine polysiloxane copolymer surfactant alone or in combination with a fluorinated hydrocarbon surfactant. The composition may be formulated as a solid or liquid suitable for dilution to form an aqueous rinse used to contact the plasticware in a warewashing machine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/37; C11D 1/00; C11D 1/75; C11D 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 10/02 (2006.01); C11D 1/825 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 1/00 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/722 (2006.01); C11D 1/75 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3738 (2013.01); C11D 1/825 (2013.01); C11D 3/37 (2013.01); C11D 3/3742 (2013.01); C11D 11/0035 (2013.01); C11D 1/004 (2013.01); C11D 1/667 (2013.01); C11D 1/722 (2013.01); C11D 1/75 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0875556 A2 19981104; EP 0875556 A3 20010124; AU 5641698 A 19981105; AU 746975 B2 20020509; BR 9801056 A 19991214; CA 2232341 A1 19981029; CA 2232341 C 20080408; JP H10310799 A 19981124

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040715

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020926

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010716

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-11-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI