Global Patent Index - EP 0875643 B1

EP 0875643 B1 2002-09-18 - Concrete form aligner

Title (en)

Concrete form aligner

Title (de)

Anschlagkörper für Betonschalungen

Title (fr)

Positionneur de coffrage

Publication

EP 0875643 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810280 A

Priority

DE 19718808 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0875643A1] The stop body (1) has a hub body (4) for accommodation of a fixture component and a hollow cylindrical cover part (6) connected with hub body via a base part (5), concentrically encompassing it. The cover part (6) has a recess (10) penetrating its wall radially, which is open against the introduction direction of the fixture part to the face side of the cover part. The recess extends from the face side of the convert to the base part, and is rectangular. Two opposing sides (19) of the recess run parallel to the longitudinal axis of the stop body. The recess extends over a peripheral area of the cover part, corresponding to 0.2 times to 0.8 times the outer diameter of the cover part.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 17/06; E04G 17/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 17/064 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0875643 A1 19981104; EP 0875643 B1 20020918; AT 224494 T 20021015; DE 19718808 A1 19981105

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170401

2018-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171103

2018-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170502

2018-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20171229

2017-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 224494 T

- Effective date: 20170401

2017-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805567

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805567 20021024

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224494 T 20021015

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020218

1999-07-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR LI

1999-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990504

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

1998-11-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI