Global Patent Index - EP 0875648 A3

EP 0875648 A3 2000-07-19 - Wide-angle hinge

Title (en)

Wide-angle hinge

Title (de)

Weitwinkelscharnier

Title (fr)

Charnière à grand angle d'ouverture

Publication

EP 0875648 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98106171 A

Priority

DE 19718429 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0875648A2] The linkage arms (2,2'), made from U-shaped profiled levers, form intersecting arms pivoting at the ends on fittings (1,1') fixed to the main body section (4) and the door (5). Their other ends are attached by links (3,3') to the fittings at separate points. The levers hinge together at a point between their end joints. The lever flanges are offset from each other so as to fit on the inside and outside. The links are likewise of channel-section and offset where they are attached to the levers. In the open position, the hinge pins (6,6',8,9,9') of the levers are on a common imaginary cylindrical dish (18), whose axis is at the outside of the fittings. The flanges of the levers and/or links can be cranked, so that in the extended open position they fit closely alongside each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 3/06 (2006.01); E05D 5/08 (2006.01); E05D 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 3/16 (2013.01); E05D 5/08 (2013.01); E05D 7/0415 (2013.01); E05D 2003/166 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0875648 A2 19981104; EP 0875648 A3 20000719; EP 0875648 B1 20011121; AT 209291 T 20011215; DE 19718429 A1 19981105; ES 2168696 T3 20020616

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2002-11-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2168696 T3

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802682 20020221

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2001-11-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19980403

2001-11-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 209291 T 20011215

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010410

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES IT

2001-03-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19980403

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 19980403

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

1998-11-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 980403