Global Patent Index - EP 0875655 A3

EP 0875655 A3 2001-02-14 - Fast drive rolling gate, in particular for industrial premises

Title (en)

Fast drive rolling gate, in particular for industrial premises

Title (de)

Schnell angetriebenes Rolltor, insbesondere für Industriegebäude

Title (fr)

Porte enroulable à entrainement rapide, notamment pour bâtiments industriels

Publication

EP 0875655 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98201364 A

Priority

IT MI970304 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0875655A2] In order to avoid, automatically, that the rolling gate (1) bumps into someone or something while they pass through the gate opening and to realise said rolling gate (1) in such a way that it has a simple, reliable and inexpensive structure, photoelectric cells (14, 15), which detect the presence of someone or something passing through the gate, are positioned at the ends of the folding arms (6) and they are positioned at a distance, from the lower edge (9) of the rolling gate (1), which is defined in function of the closing speed of the gate (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/13; E06B 9/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/00 (2006.01); E06B 9/13 (2006.01); E06B 9/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/13 (2013.01); E05F 15/43 (2013.01); E06B 9/82 (2013.01); E05F 2015/434 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/47 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/13 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/46 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/00 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/106 (2013.01); E06B 2009/6836 (2013.01); E06B 2009/6845 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0875655 A2 19981104; EP 0875655 A3 20010214; IT 237463 Y1 20000913; IT MI970304 U1 19981030; IT MI970304 V0 19970430

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010815

2001-12-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-11-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI