Global Patent Index - EP 0875656 B1

EP 0875656 B1 2003-06-04 - Rollable motorised product equipped with a stop device which is sensitive to a weight variation

Title (en)

Rollable motorised product equipped with a stop device which is sensitive to a weight variation

Title (de)

Aufrollbares motorisiertes Produkt, welches mit einer Stopvorrichtung ausgerüstet ist, die eine Gewichtsveränderung erfasst

Title (fr)

Produit enroulable motorisé équipé d'un dispositif d'arrêt sensible à une variation de poids

Publication

EP 0875656 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98810278 A

Priority

FR 9705280 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0875656A1] The motorised roller blind or shutter is driven by an electric motor, and is fitted with an automatic detector to switch off the supply to the motor when the blind or shutter reaches the end of its travel. The detector senses the change in the weight of the blind when it makes contact with an object. The roller is supported at its two ends by an arm connected to a fixed support. A spring compensates the weight of the roller mechanism. The orientation of the arm varies with the weight of the roller mechanism, with the raising of the arm operating the contacts that initiate switching of the supply.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/88

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/88 (2006.01); E06B 9/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/88 (2013.01); E06B 2009/6854 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0875656 A1 19981104; EP 0875656 B1 20030604; AT 242414 T 20030615; DE 69815205 D1 20030710; DE 69815205 T2 20040415; ES 2124683 T1 19990216; ES 2124683 T3 20040401; FR 2762643 A1 19981030; FR 2762643 B1 19990702

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-04-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIMU

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2124683 T3

2004-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040318

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040316

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-03 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-11-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-09-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69815205 P 20030710

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL SE

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-06-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-06-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

1999-07-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL SE

1999-05-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990318

1999-02-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2124683 T1

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL SE

1998-11-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI