Global patent index - EP 0875864 A3

EP 0875864 A3 2000-08-30 - System for communicating between stations of a franking machine

Title (en)

System for communicating between stations of a franking machine

Title (de)

Anordnung zur Kommunikation zwischen Stationen einer Postbearbeitungsmaschine

Title (fr)

Système pour communiquer entre stations d'une machine d'affranchissement

Publication

EP 0875864 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98250060 A

Priority

DE 19711997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0875864A2] The communication circuit uses a pair of interfaces at each station of the post handling machine and a respective data cable extending between each 2 successive stations, allowing the incoming information received by each station to be transferred to the next station. The machine control is programmed to allow the information received by each station to be fed on to the next station via the interfaces and the data cable link, facilitating emergency cut-out of the post handling machine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00314 (2013.01); G07B 17/00193 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00241 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00322 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00346 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19711997 A1 19980917; EP 0875864 A2 19981104; EP 0875864 A3 20000830; US 6178410 B1 20010123

INPADOC legal status

2011-10-12 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20110907

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010122

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 07B 17/00 A

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-11-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI