Global patent index - EP 0875875 A3

EP 0875875 A3 2000-06-28 - Method and device for alerting auxiliary or surveillance organs

Title (en)

Method and device for alerting auxiliary or surveillance organs

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Alarmieren von Hilfs- oder Überwachungsorganen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour alerter des organes d'aide ou de surveillance

Publication

EP 0875875 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98810288 A

Priority

CH 78097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0875875A2] The assistance alarm call method uses a portable alarm call device, with a memory holding an emergency call code and/or an identification code, activated in an emergency situation for calling for assistance from the emergency services. The portable device incorporates a global positioning satellite reception circuit, for providing the actual position coordinates, transmitted to the alarm call centre together with the alarm call.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 25/01; G08B 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 25/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 25/016 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0875875 A2 19981104; EP 0875875 A3 20000628

INPADOC legal status

2001-05-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001101

2001-04-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 08B 25/01 A, 7G 08B 21/00 B

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-11-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI