Global Patent Index - EP 0875959 B1

EP 0875959 B1 2000-11-08 - Connector system

Title (en)

Connector system

Title (de)

Steckverbindungssystem

Title (fr)

Système de connexion

Publication

EP 0875959 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97107167 A

Priority

EP 97107167 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0875959A1] A connector unit 1 comprises a latching shell 3 having three peripheral resilient tongues 4 at substantially 120 DEG from one another each bearing an outwardly projecting latch 5. A catching sleeve 28 also arranged in the connector unit 1 has three peripheral arms 30 at substantially 120 DEG from one another each provided with an inner latch catching groove 31. The peripheral arms 30 of the catching sleeve 28 are located angularly between the resilient tongues 4 of the latching shell 3, whereby the latches 5 are circumferentially alternating with the latch catching grooves 31. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/00; H01R 13/627; H01R 24/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/639 (2006.01); H01R 13/627 (2006.01); H01R 24/84 (2011.01); H01R 107/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 23/27 (2013.01); H01R 13/6277 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0875959 A1 19981104; EP 0875959 B1 20001108; AT 197519 T 20001111; AU 726404 B2 20001109; AU 7521798 A 19981124; CA 2289015 A1 19981105; CA 2289015 C 20021112; CN 1122336 C 20030924; CN 1254450 A 20000524; DE 69703477 D1 20001214; DE 69703477 T2 20010523; DK 0875959 T3 20010226; ES 2153618 T3 20010301; HK 1026522 A1 20040227; IL 132383 A 20020912; IL 132383 D0 20010319; JP 2000510642 A 20000815; JP 3174583 B2 20010611; KR 100315243 B1 20011126; KR 20010020398 A 20010315; NO 316415 B1 20040119; NO 995323 A 19991101; NO 995323 D0 19991101; WO 9849753 A1 19981105

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160501

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-02-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160502

2017-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160501

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161230

2017-01-25 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2016-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160430

2016-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 197519 T

- Effective date: 20160430

2016-12-07 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160501

2016-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-11-21 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20160430

2016-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69703477

2016-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150429

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150423

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150318

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150423

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150410

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150428

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150414

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150317

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150313

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153618 T3

2001-02-26 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-01-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2001-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUGNION S.A.

2000-12-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703477 20001214

2000-12-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2000-11-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197519 T 20001111

2000-06-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/00 A, 7H 01R 13/627 B, 7H 01R 24/18 B

1999-07-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

1998-12-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981106

1998-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971215

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

1998-11-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;SI