Global Patent Index - EP 0876077 A3

EP 0876077 A3 2001-02-07 - Method and apparatus for addition of signals existing as sampling values

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for addition of signals existing as sampling values

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Addition von als Abtastwerte vorliegenden Signalen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour addition des signaux existants comme valeurs d'échangillons

Publication

EP 0876077 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98440051 A

Priority

DE 19716314 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2230481A1] A method of forming an aggregation of N > 1 band-limited time signals, each with a bandwidth of ~ B, which are present as analog and/or digital sampling values, with a respective sampling frequency of fA > 2B, is characterized in that the sampling values of all N time signals are offset in time and superimposed on each other, and are jointly input to a low-pass filter (12) with a bandwidth of B' > B, and that a composite signal is tapped off from the output of the low-pass filter (12). This allows the aggregation to be performed in a considerably shorter calculation time, a number of slow and expensive aggregation elements can possibly be saved, and the damping of the signals during processing can be minimized, as well as the corresponding loss of information.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 11/04; H03H 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03K 5/13 (2006.01); G06J 1/00 (2006.01); H03K 5/00 (2006.01); H04Q 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06J 1/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19716314 A1 19981022; CA 2230481 A1 19981018; DE 59813972 D1 20070531; EP 0876077 A2 19981104; EP 0876077 A3 20010207; EP 0876077 B1 20070418; JP 4056126 B2 20080305; JP H1175273 A 19990316; US 6272181 B1 20010807

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130313

2014-01-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59813972

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130313

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120330

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120227

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120328

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070418

2008-03-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080121

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070418

2007-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-09-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070729

2007-07-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070718

2007-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59813972 P 20070531

2007-05-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070427

2007-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2006-06-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NAXOS DATA LLC

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010619

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04Q 11/04 A, 7H 03H 17/06 B

1999-02-24 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: ALCATEL

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1998-11-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI