Global Patent Index - EP 0876114 B1

EP 0876114 B1 2000-03-29 - DEVICE FOR ATTACHING THE EXTREMITY OF A LINK TO AN OBJECT, PARTICULARLY A WATCH

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR ATTACHING THE EXTREMITY OF A LINK TO AN OBJECT, PARTICULARLY A WATCH

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINES UHRENARMBANDES

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION D'UNE EXTREMITE D'UN LIEN A UN OBJET, NOTAMMENT UNE MONTRE

Publication

EP 0876114 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96940697 A

Priority

  • FR 9515804 A
  • IB 9601459 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2742638A1] Device for attaching the extremity of a link (14), particularly a bracelet, to an object, particularly a watch, comprising a case (1, 16, 31) equipped with two pins (3, 18, 33) designed to be inserted in the opposing housings of the object. At least one of the pins is capable of adapting two positions, one in which it protrudes outside the case for insertion in one of the housings of the object's installation slot, the other, in which it remains retracted. A mobile control mechanism (10, 20, 35), rotating or clasping, attached to a cam (10b, 20a, 35b) in contact with the internal extremity (3a, 18b, 34) of one of the pins (3, 18, 33) and held to the cam (10b, 20a, 35b) by an elastic mechanism (4, 19, 32) can be activated to bring the pin (3, 18, 33) into the retracted position against the pressure exerted by the elastic mechanism (4, 19, 32).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 5/14; G04B 37/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/14 (2006.01); G04B 37/14 (2006.01); G04B 37/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/147 (2013.01); G04B 37/1493 (2013.01); Y10T 24/2155 (2013.01); Y10T 24/3984 (2013.01); Y10T 24/4718 (2013.01); Y10T 24/4782 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2742638 A1 19970627; FR 2742638 B1 19980220; AU 1069797 A 19970728; DE 69607491 D1 20000504; DE 69607491 T2 20001214; EP 0876114 A1 19981111; EP 0876114 B1 20000329; ES 2146917 T3 20000816; HK 1016441 A1 20010119; JP 2000505664 A 20000516; TW 358717 B 19990521; US 6014793 A 20000118; WO 9724044 A1 19970710

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-09-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160831

2016-07-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-01-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: GRIFFES CONSULTING SA

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071223

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071224

2009-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20071224

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-12-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20061228

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-12-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061218

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-08-11 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031223

2004-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MADY'S TIME PROPERTIES LLC.

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031223

2002-12-06 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20021206

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021128

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-09 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010109

2000-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-23 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001223

2000-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-08-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146917 T3

2000-06-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-06-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ORGANIZZAZIONE D'AGOSTINI

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: GRIFFES CONSULTING S.A.

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607491 20000504

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

2000-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990312

1998-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980727

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU MC NL PT