Global Patent Index - EP 0876218 B1

EP 0876218 B1 2000-10-25 - HEATING OF A SPECIMEN CARRIER

Title (en)

HEATING OF A SPECIMEN CARRIER

Title (de)

ERWÄRMUNG EINES PROBEN-TRÄGERS

Title (fr)

CHAUFFAGE D'UN PORTEUR D'ECHANTILLONS

Publication

EP 0876218 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97901166 A

Priority

  • GB 9700195 W
  • GB 9601471 A
  • GB 9603717 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9726993A1] A method and apparatus for heating specimens in wells of a metallic specimen carrier. The specimen carrier is heated by applying resistive heating directly to the carrier. An AC source and transformer may be used where the specimen carrier is in series with a single turn secondary winding of the transformer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01L 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12M 1/00 (2006.01); B01F 13/08 (2006.01); B01L 3/00 (2006.01); B01L 7/00 (2006.01); G01N 33/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01L 3/50851 (2013.01); B01F 13/0818 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9726993 A1 19970731; AT 197129 T 20001115; AU 1451097 A 19970820; CA 2244178 A1 19970731; CA 2244178 C 20081014; DE 69703381 D1 20001130; DE 69703381 T2 20010412; DK 0876218 T3 20010108; EP 0876218 A1 19981111; EP 0876218 B1 20001025; ES 2151241 T3 20001216; GR 3034671 T3 20010131; JP 2000505889 A 20000516; JP 3705606 B2 20051012; PT 876218 E 20010330

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170123

2017-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170122

2017-04-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170428

2017-04-12 [REG GR MA] RIGHT EXPIRED

- Document: GR 20000402296

- Effective date: 20170124

2017-03-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 197129 T

- Effective date: 20170123

2017-03-07 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-02-22 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2017-02-15 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170122

2017-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-01-30 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20170123

2017-01-25 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20170122

2017-01-23 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69703381

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160129

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160129

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160129

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160129

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160129

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160201

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160126

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20160129

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160129

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160129

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160204

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20160201

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69703381

- Representative's name: REICHERT & LINDNER PARTNERSCHAFT PATENTANWAELT, DE

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BJS COMPANY LTD.

- Free text: BJS COMPANY LTD.#65 BIDEFORT AVENUE#PERIVALE, GREENFORD, MIDDLESEX UB6 7PP (GB) -TRANSFER TO- BJS COMPANY LTD.#65 BIDEFORT AVENUE#PERIVALE, GREENFORD, MIDDLESEX UB6 7PP (GB)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20001130

2001-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-01-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-08 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151241 T3

2000-11-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703381 20001130

2000-11-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-10-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197129 T 20001115

1999-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991013

1999-11-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: HEATING OF A SPECIMEN CARRIER

1998-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980722

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE