Global Patent Index - EP 0876223 B1

EP 0876223 B1 2000-04-26 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR KEEPING CLEAN ENDS OF SPRAY DAMPING MECHANISM NOZZLES ON A ROTARY PRINTING PRESS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR KEEPING CLEAN ENDS OF SPRAY DAMPING MECHANISM NOZZLES ON A ROTARY PRINTING PRESS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM SAUBERHALTEN VON DÜSENMUNDSTÜCKEN AN DÜSEN EINES SPRÜHFEUCHTWERKES EINER ROTATIONSDRUCKMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR MAINTENIR PROPRES DES NEZ DE BUSES D'UN DISPOSITIF DE MOUILLAGE PAR PULVERISATION D'UNE ROTATIVE

Publication

EP 0876223 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97914064 A

Priority

  • DE 9700076 W
  • DE 19602228 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9726996A2] The invention concerns a method of removing deposits from a nozzle end, in which pressurized fluid is delivered to the nozzle end. This fluid is activated by ultrasound in front of or inside the nozzle end. An ultrasound vibrator, used to carry out the method, is directly or indirectly connected to the fluid by means of a vibration-transmitter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 15/02; B41F 7/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9726996 A2 19970731; WO 9726996 A3 19971023; EP 0876223 A2 19981111; EP 0876223 B1 20000426; ES 2146463 T3 20000801; US 6067908 A 20000530

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070117

2007-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060118

2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060117

2006-09-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060118

2006-01-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060118

2006-01-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060117

2005-03-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050329

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050124

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-20 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050120

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-20 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050120

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050118

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050118

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146463 T3

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701511 20000531

2000-05-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

1999-08-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6B 05B 15/02 A, 6B 41F 7/30 B

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981216

1998-12-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1998-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980715

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE