Global Patent Index - EP 0876229 B8

EP 0876229 B8 2002-11-20 - BENDING OF ELONGATE ELEMENTS

Title (en)

BENDING OF ELONGATE ELEMENTS

Title (de)

BIEGEN VON LANGGESTRECKTEN ELEMENTEN

Title (fr)

PLIAGE D'ELEMENTS ALLONGES

Publication

EP 0876229 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 97909413 A

Priority

  • GB 9702800 W
  • GB 9622234 A
  • GB 9718708 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9818580A1] A slit (H) is cut in the top (2) and bottom (1) walls of an elongate box section tube and a side force (F) applied so that a bend can be introduced. The slit is elongate and has end portions shaped to encourage the bending.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 11/18; E04C 3/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 11/18 (2006.01); B62D 21/00 (2006.01); B62D 25/08 (2006.01); E04C 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B62D 25/08 (2013.01); B21D 11/18 (2013.01); B62D 21/00 (2013.01); E04C 2003/0421 (2013.01); E04C 2003/043 (2013.01); E04C 2003/0465 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9818580 A1 19980507; AU 4710497 A 19980522; DE 69712465 D1 20020613; EP 0876229 A1 19981111; EP 0876229 B1 20020508; EP 0876229 B8 20021120; EP 0876229 B8 20030122; NO 312657 B1 20020617; NO 982914 A 19980825; NO 982914 D0 19980622

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081027

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081027

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071003

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030211

2003-01-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-01-15 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Free text: RANDLE, JAMES, NEVILLE * JARRETT, MARTIN * ROGERS, ANDREW

2002-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-08-09 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020809

2002-08-08 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020808

2002-06-26 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Free text: RANDLE, JAMES, NEVILLE * JARRETT, MARTIN * ROGERS, ANDREW

2002-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69712465 20020613

2002-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-05-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BRITISH ALUMINIUM LIMITED

2002-05-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: RANDLE, JAMES NEVILLE

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI

2002-05-08 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020508

2002-05-08 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020508

2002-05-08 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020508

2002-05-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020508

2002-05-08 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020508

2002-04-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BRITISH ALUMINIUM LIMITED

2002-04-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: RANDLE, JAMES NEVILLE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-05-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000327

1998-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980727

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI