Global Patent Index - EP 0876246 B1

EP 0876246 B1 2003-06-11 - A KNIFE SHAFT ASSEMBLY WITH DIE CUTTING INSERTS FOR A ROTARY DIE CUTTER AND THE DIE CUTTER ITSELF

Title (en)

A KNIFE SHAFT ASSEMBLY WITH DIE CUTTING INSERTS FOR A ROTARY DIE CUTTER AND THE DIE CUTTER ITSELF

Title (de)

WELLE MIT STANZWERKZEUGEN FÜR EINE ROTATIONSSTANZMASCHINE,SOWIE DIE ROTATIONSSTANZMASCHINE SELBST

Title (fr)

ARBRE AVEC DES INSERTS DE DECOUPE A L'EMPORTE-PIECE POUR MATRICE DE COUPE ROTATIVE ET MATRICE DE COUPE

Publication

EP 0876246 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96945072 A

Priority

  • US 9620711 W
  • US 1063696 P
  • US 66757896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9727033A1] A die cutting insert (18) for a rotary die cutter is disclosed as well as the die itself. The insert includes a base (34) formed on a predetermined radius. The base has first and second spaced apart ends (36, 38) and first and second oppositely aligned surfaces (40, 42). A knife (44) is formed about the periphery of the first surface (40). The knife (44) has a cutting edge (46) and first and second side walls (48, 50). The cutting edge (46) has a width of less than about .005 inches. In addition, the first side wall (48) is aligned approximately perpendicular to the cutting edge (46) while the second side wall (50) is aligned at an angle of at least about 15 DEG relative to the cutting edge. The insert (18) also includes means for removably attaching it to a die shaft. The means includes at least one aperture (56) formed adjacent to each of the first and second ends (36, 38). The apertures (56) extend completely through the base (34) and each is sized to receive a threaded bolt (60). The threaded bolts (60) can be torqued to a predetermined value to secure the insert to the die shaft (14). The rotary die cutter includes a die shaft (14) having one or more replaceable and/or interchangeable die cutting inserts (18) mounted thereto and is aligned to cooperate with a rotatable anvil roll (12). The die shaft (14) and anvil roll (12) are arranged to form a nip (20) therebetween. Material (22) which is to be cut can pass through the nip (20) and will be cut into the desired shape (24) of the die cutting inserts (18).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26F 1/44; B26D 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/40 (2006.01); B26D 7/26 (2006.01); B26F 1/38 (2006.01); B26F 1/42 (2006.01); B26F 1/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/2614 (2013.01); B26F 1/44 (2013.01); B26D 2007/2607 (2013.01); B26F 1/384 (2013.01); B26F 2001/4472 (2013.01); B26F 2001/4481 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9727033 A1 19970731; AU 1352897 A 19970820; DE 69628668 D1 20030717; DE 69628668 T2 20040429; DE 69628668 T8 20040812; EP 0876246 A1 19981111; EP 0876246 B1 20030611; JP 2000503262 A 20000321; KR 100441574 B1 20041203

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2005-12-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051219

2004-12-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041230

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-12-01 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041201

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-11 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031219

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031219

2003-11-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-09-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030922

2003-09-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69628668 P 20030717

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-11 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-06-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2002-06-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: A KNIFE SHAFT ASSEMBLY WITH DIE CUTTING INSERTS FOR A ROTARY DIE CUTTER AND THE DIE CUTTER ITSELF

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010216

1998-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980730

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE