Global Patent Index - EP 0876256 B1

EP 0876256 B1 2000-04-19 - SPRAY MOISTENER

Title (en)

SPRAY MOISTENER

Title (de)

SPRÜHFEUCHTWERK

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE MOUILLAGE PAR PULVERISATION

Publication

EP 0876256 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97914063 A

Priority

  • DE 9700075 W
  • DE 19602408 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9727052A2] Deposits on nozzle outlets are prevented by means of a device on a spray moistener, in that there is a ductor device acting on the airflow around the surface of the cylinder and extending axially parallel to the cylinder in front of the nozzles when viewed in the direction of rotation of the cylinder to be sprayed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 7/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9727052 A2 19970731; WO 9727052 A3 19971023; EP 0876256 A2 19981111; EP 0876256 B1 20000419; EP 0956949 A2 19991117; EP 0956949 A3 19991229

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070117

2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060117

2006-09-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060118

2006-01-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060117

2005-03-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050329

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050124

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-20 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050120

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-20 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050120

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050118

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000522

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701465 20000525

2000-05-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-04-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHOEPS, MARTIN, HEINZ

1999-11-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981217

1998-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980716

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE