Global Patent Index - EP 0876281 B1

EP 0876281 B1 2000-04-26 - SET OF BLANKS, BOX, METHOD AND MACHINE FOR MAKING A BOX FROM SAID SET OF BLANKS

Title (en)

SET OF BLANKS, BOX, METHOD AND MACHINE FOR MAKING A BOX FROM SAID SET OF BLANKS

Title (de)

SATZ VON ZUSCHNITTEN UND BEHÄLTERN,SOWIE VERFAHREN UND MASCHINE ZUM HERSTELLEN VON BEHÄLTERN AUSGEHEND VON EINEM SOLCHEN SATZ VON ZUSCHNITTEN

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE DE DECOUPES, BOITE, PROCEDE ET MACHINE POUR LA FABRICATION DE BOITE A PARTIR D'UN TEL ENSEMBLE DE DECOUPES

Publication

EP 0876281 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97901131 A

Priority

  • FR 9700113 W
  • FR 9600677 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9727114A1] A set of blanks, a box, a method and a machine for making a packaging box that includes at least two blanks made of a fibreboard or corrugated fibreboard sheet material, i.e. a first blank comprising a series of at least four flaps for forming the side walls of the box, and a second blank comprising at least two panels joined together along a third fold line. The second blank straddles at least one fold line of the first blank, the first panel is attached to and/or centred on the first blank, and at least one of the second panels is attached to the first blank via means that enable movement of the second panels relative to the first blank when the box is formed by simultaneously wrapping said blanks around a volume having a predetermined size.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/56; B31B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 7/00 (2006.01); B65D 5/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/566 (2013.01); B31B 2217/0076 (2013.01); Y10S 229/93 (2013.01); Y10S 229/939 (2013.01); Y10S 493/907 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9727114 A1 19970731; AT 192101 T 20000515; AU 1448597 A 19970820; AU 712088 B2 19991028; DE 69701789 D1 20000531; DE 69701789 T2 20001123; EP 0876281 A1 19981111; EP 0876281 B1 20000426; FR 2743780 A1 19970725; FR 2743780 B1 19980417; NZ 326394 A 19981028; US 6015084 A 20000118

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-01-21 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69701789

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: CRONIN INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY

2007-04-13 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: JOHN P. MUNZINGER C/O CRONIN INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY;CHEMIN DE PRECOSSY 31;1260 NYON (CH)

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-09 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010109

2000-10-25 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-10-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-07-26 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: JOHN P. MUNZINGER INGENIEUR-CONSEIL

2000-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701789 20000531

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT

2000-04-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192101 T 20000515

1999-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990416

1998-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980814

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT