Global patent index - EP 0876292 B1

EP 0876292 B1 2000-06-07 - MOBILE CRANE

Title (en)

MOBILE CRANE

Title (de)

MOBILKRAN

Title (fr)

GRUE MOBILE

Publication

EP 0876292 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97902203 A

Priority

  • DE 19603966 A
  • EP 9700292 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19603966A1] The invention relates to a mobile crane, in particular one intended for use in the transhipment of containers. The crane comprises a lower chassis (U) with at least two wheel axles (F1-F4) provided with steerable and separately drivable wheels (FR). A revolving platform (D) with its superstucture is mounted on the lower chassis (U) centrally between the wheel axles (F1-F4), the diameter of the platform being approximately equal to the vehicle width (b). The platform is provided with counterweights (G), an operator's cabin (K) and a telescopic jib (A) capable of pivoting on the platform about a horizontal tilting axis (W) under the action of a support cylinder (Z) also mounted on the platform (D) in such a way as to be mobile, and the support cylinder is coupled to the platform on a radial pointing to the tilting-axis (W). A manoeuvrable crane of this type can be used in a stacking area with the narrowest lane width and/or for rapid horizontal transport and can stack containers both laterally and frontally.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 23/42; B66F 9/065

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/42 (2006.01); B66F 9/065 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/0655 (2013.01); B66C 23/42 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19603966 A1 19970731; AU 1594297 A 19970820; CA 2244254 A1 19970731; EP 0876292 A1 19981111; EP 0876292 B1 20000607; WO 9727138 A1 19970731

INPADOC legal status

2001-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011101

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-06 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-11-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-09-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000907

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701841

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-13

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT SE

2000-06-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-06-07 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-06-07 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-06-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-06-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000607

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981217

1998-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980609

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT SE